Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1651 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15057 Week
» 68073 Month
» 187600 Year
» 3214453 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2373 |
02/08/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/08/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2373 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
20/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2373 from Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
03/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Manvers Main |
|
|