Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1747 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19550 Week
» 72566 Month
» 192093 Year
» 3218946 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D238 |
12/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40038 |
12/12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
12/10/1959 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
28/12/1980 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
03/1982 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
12/10/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
12/12/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/10/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
12/12/1973 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D238 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
12/12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40038 |
|
|
28/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40038 |
|
|
03/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|