Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1642 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15048 Week
» 68064 Month
» 187591 Year
» 3214444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2382 |
08/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03382 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow ends, black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/11/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2382 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow ends, black chevrons |
|
|
20/08/1972 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03382 |
|
|
02/10/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03382 |
|
|
28/02/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|