Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 864 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1743 Week
» 10485 Month
» 354664 Year
» 865766 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2393 03/07/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 03/07/1961
Withdrawn 31/12/1969
Time in Service 8 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1971
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
8A Edge Hill (New) 03/07/1961
8C Speke Junction w/e 30/03/1963
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 31/12/1966
   Withdrawn 31/12/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/07/1961 To Service To service as D2393
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Edge Hill (8A)
   
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
31/12/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2393    
01/05/1971 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev