Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 400 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18203 Week
» 71219 Month
» 190746 Year
» 3217599 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2395 |
12/08/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/08/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2395 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
17/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2395 from Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
09/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|