Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 949 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18752 Week
» 71768 Month
» 191295 Year
» 3218148 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11179 |
29/09/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2402 |
28/02/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/09/1956 |
|
No train brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/09/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11179 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
28/02/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2402 |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
10/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2402 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|