Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1001 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8461 Week
» 5974 Month
» 233858 Year
» 1455423 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2407   11/1891

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Dean
Class Dean Goods
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 87
Works Number 1277
To Service During 11/1891
Withdrawal During 01/1952
Service Life 60 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1891
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 89A Oswestry m/e 31/01/1951
WDN   m/e 31/01/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during April included:- 2095, 2159, 2407, 2612, 2655, 2702, 2784, 2787, 2808, 2835, 2936, 2937, 2940, 2949, 2954, 2989, 3012, 3018, 3048, 3150, 3386, 3586, 3594, 4007, 4020, 4023, 4042, 4078, 4381, 4920, 4968, 4971, 5012, 5043, 5305, 5375, 5960, 5986, 6023, 6309, 6344, 6399, 6953, 6970, and L.M.S. 8465. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are 3663, 8713, and 8794. Works' pilots during April included: 200, 207, 1542, 1795, 1796, 2723, 2773 and 3561. New engines reported are: 1029 PDN, 9404 PDN. SLS/194706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1891 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2407
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1277
   
01/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 2407    

prev prev