|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering works during October and November included 1366, 1409, 1416, 1538, 2017, 2092, 2212, 2411, 2538, 2612, 2708, 2792,2817, 2825, 2836, 2842, 2851, 2859, 2882, 2883, 2884, 2885, 2906, 2927, 2947, 2955,2980, 2987, 2889, 3016, 3026, 3363, 3421, 4038, 4042. 4046, 4052, 4059, 4903, 4934,4953, 4954, 4966, 4973, 5949, 5961, 5989, 5997, 6917, 6922, 6929, 6947, 6959, 70876, 77086, 77326, and 79309 | SLS/194701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1891 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2411 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1281 |
||
05/1903 | Modification | Modification: S4 boiler fitted | ||
04/1906 | Modification | Modification: S2 boiler fitted | ||
08/1911 | Modification | Modification: S4 boiler fitted | ||
08/1914 | Modification | Modification: B4 boiler fitted | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carmarthen (CARM) | ||
29/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) | ||
04/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
21/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
14/04/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2411 | ||
22/05/1954 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |