Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2413 08/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 06001 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 08/10/1958
Withdrawn 06/09/1976
Time in Service 17 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1977
Cut At Campbells (Airdrie)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
60A Inverness (New) 08/10/1958
62C Dunfermline Upper 8w/e 25/06/1966
64H Leith Central 4w/e 26/08/1967
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 29/04/1972
65A Eastfield 5w/e 05/08/1972
   Stored 6w/e 04/09/1976
   Withdrawn 06/09/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/10/1958 To Service To service as D2413
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Inverness (60A)
   
25/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
26/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
13/04/1968 Sightings Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow RCTS 6/1968 Link
29/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
05/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 06001    
04/09/1976 Allocation      
04/09/1976 To Store To Store    
06/09/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 06001    
31/12/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev