Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2414 24/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 06002 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 24/10/1958
Withdrawn 06/09/1981
Time in Service 22 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 30/04/1982
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61C Keith (New) 24/10/1958
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 5w/e 29/01/1966
62C Dunfermline Townhill 5w/e 06/02/1971
62C Dunfermline Townhill 4w/e 28/10/1972
   Withdrawn 06/09/1981


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/10/1958 To Service To service as D2414
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Keith (61C)
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
27/08/1968 Sightings Dundee depot: Around the area - Stabled east of the station RO 12/1968 Link
06/02/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C)    
28/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 06002    
06/09/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 06002    
30/04/1982 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev