Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 971 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7178 Week
» 4691 Month
» 232575 Year
» 1454140 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2414   12/1891

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Dean
Class Dean Goods
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 87
Works Number 1284
To Service During 12/1891
Withdrawal During 03/1953
Service Life 61 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1891
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 17/05/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 19/04/1952
WDN   m/e 31/03/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1422/53, 2053, 2230/33, 2414, 2805/10/25, 2915/30/34/35, 3421, 3610, 3709, 3824/48/58, 4017/19/50/89/92/99, 4248/57, 4500/24/50/74/75, 4706, 4906/09/37/63/64, 5037,91/95, 5314, 5900/06124/30/41/60/64/81, 6009/21/26, 6119/24/34/51/62/68, 6313/56/72/98, 6806/63, 6918, 7003, 7321, W.D. 77000, 78607, 79283/288. W.D. No. 77060/145/280/335, 78624 an 79244 have had their tenders removed and were taken to the stock shed on 25/3, where they are now stored. Works' pilots have been: Nos. 198, 1713/53, 2781 an 15102 PDN. New Work 30/4: 15102 PDN (being run in as Works' pilot); 6990; 9662 NPT, 9663 TN, 9664 NPT, 9665, 9666 NEA; 7008 being nearly complete. Engines condemned during April included: Nos. 302 an 3408 SLS/194806
31/12/1948 Swindon Works New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1891 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2414
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1284
   
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
03/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 2414    

prev prev