Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 991 Today
» 1245 Yesterday
» 7135 Week
» 38924 Month
» 187689 Year
» 1409254 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2415 06/11/1958  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 06/11/1958
Withdrawn 15/06/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1968
Cut At Campbells (Airdrie)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61C Keith (New) 06/11/1958
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 5w/e 29/01/1966
64H Leith Central 4w/e 27/05/1967
   Withdrawn 15/06/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/11/1958 To Service To service as D2415
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Keith (61C)
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
15/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2415    
01/10/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev