Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 99 Today
» 1336 Yesterday
» 3872 Week
» 3872 Month
» 193007 Year
» 1414572 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2416 29/11/1958  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 29/11/1958
Withdrawn 19/11/1972
Time in Service 13 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1973
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 29/11/1958
62C Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 30/04/1966
64H Leith Central 4w/e 27/05/1967
62B Dundee West 4w/e 26/02/1972
   Withdrawn 19/11/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/11/1958 To Service To service as D2416
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
26/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (62B)    
19/11/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D2416    
01/11/1973 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev