Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1025 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3124 Week
» 14695 Month
» 262988 Year
» 1147369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2417 11/12/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 11/12/1958
Withdrawn 15/06/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At Campbells (Airdrie)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 11/12/1958
62C Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 30/04/1966
64H Leith Central 4w/e 27/05/1967
   Withdrawn 15/06/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/12/1958 To Service To service as D2417
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
15/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2417    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev