Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 514 Today
» 1245 Yesterday
» 6658 Week
» 38447 Month
» 187212 Year
» 1408777 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2418 09/01/1959  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/01/1959
Withdrawn 15/12/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1968
Cut At Campbells (Airdrie)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 09/01/1959
64H Leith Central 4w/e 27/05/1967
   Withdrawn 15/12/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/01/1959 To Service To service as D2418
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
01/12/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    
15/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2418    

prev prev