Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 124 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19035 Week
» 83989 Month
» 286653 Year
» 3313506 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D242 |
02/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40042 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
02/11/1959 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
14/12/1980 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 03/1981 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Derby) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
02/11/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/11/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D242 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40042 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
14/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40042 |
|
|
03/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|