Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 328 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1194 Week
» 25856 Month
» 284715 Year
» 795817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2420 14/02/1959
TOPS (Tops) 06003 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
To Service 14/02/1959
Withdrawn 01/02/1981
Time in Service 21 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 14/02/1959
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
66A Polmadie 5w/e 03/07/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Withdrawn 01/02/1981

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/02/1959 To Service To service as D2420
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed RO 11/1968 Link
03/07/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 06003    
01/02/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 06003    

prev prev