Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2421 24/02/1959
TOPS (Tops) 06004 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 24/02/1959
Withdrawn 19/03/1979
Time in Service 20 yrs , 23 dys
Cut Up 28/02/1980
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/02/1959
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
65A Eastfield 4w/e 25/01/1969
DT Dunfermline Townhill 4w/e 28/12/1974
HN Hamilton (West) 4w/e 01/03/1975
DE Dundee West 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 19/03/1979


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/02/1959 To Service To service as D2421
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed RO 11/1968 Link
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 06004    
28/12/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (DT)    
01/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (HN)    
26/07/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (DE)    
19/03/1979 Withdrawn Condemned as 06004    
28/02/1980 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev