Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 277 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2184 Week
» 20966 Month
» 269259 Year
» 1153640 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2422 20/03/1959
TOPS (Tops) 06005 01/1975

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 20/03/1959
Withdrawn 06/10/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 31/07/1983
Cut At British Rail (at Dundee MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 20/03/1959
60A Inverness 5w/e 30/01/1965
65A Eastfield 4w/e 24/06/1967
62B Dundee West 4w/e 28/06/1969
   Withdrawn 06/10/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/03/1959 To Service To service as D2422
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
30/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
28/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (62B)    
01/1975 Renumbered Renumbered to 06005    
06/10/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 06005    
31/07/1983 Scrapped Broken up by British Rail: at Dundee MPD    

prev prev