Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 455 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6209 Week
» 34167 Month
» 68809 Year
» 1290374 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2423 09/04/1959
TOPS (Tops) 06006 11/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/04/1959
Withdrawn 09/06/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs , 2 mths
Cut Up 31/07/1983
Cut At British Rail (at Dundee MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 09/04/1959
60A Inverness 4w/e 09/05/1959
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 03/07/1971
   Withdrawn 09/06/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/04/1959 To Service To service as D2423
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
15/07/1969 Sightings Inverness shed and environs: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
03/07/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
11/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 06006    
09/06/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 06006    
31/07/1983 Scrapped Broken up by British Rail: at Dundee MPD    

prev prev