Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1095 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14501 Week
» 67517 Month
» 187044 Year
» 3213897 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2426 |
25/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
06007 |
04/1975 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2426 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
08/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
11/03/1969 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
26/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
24/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
24/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 06007 |
|
|
06/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
26/09/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 06007 |
|
|
08/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|