Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2426 25/11/1959
TOPS (Tops) 06007 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 25/11/1959
Withdrawn 26/09/1977
Time in Service 17 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 31/08/1979
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66B Motherwell (New) 25/11/1959
66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 08/04/1961
65A Eastfield 4w/e 24/02/1968
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 27/04/1968
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1969
64H Leith Central (Reinstated) w/e 15/03/1969
62C Dunfermline Townhill 4w/e 26/02/1972
62B Dundee West 4w/e 24/02/1973
62C Dunfermline Townhill 4w/e 24/03/1973
   Withdrawn 26/09/1977


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/11/1959 To Service To service as D2426
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Motherwell (66B)
   
08/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
24/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
27/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
02/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2426    
15/03/1969 Reinstated Reinstated to Leith Central (64H)    
26/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 06007    
24/02/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (62B)    
24/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C)    
26/09/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as 06007    
31/08/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev