Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2428 21/12/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/12/1959
Withdrawn 15/06/1968
Time in Service 8 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1969
Cut At Campbells (Airdrie)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66B Motherwell (New) 21/12/1959
66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/04/1960
66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 11/03/1961
66C Hamilton (West) 5w/e 30/05/1964
66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/06/1968
   Withdrawn 15/06/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1959 To Service To service as D2428
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Motherwell (66B)
   
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
01/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
15/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2428    
01/02/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev