Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 294 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18097 Week
» 71113 Month
» 190640 Year
» 3217493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2428 |
21/12/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2428 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2428 |
|
|
02/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|