Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 527 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2434 Week
» 21216 Month
» 269509 Year
» 1153890 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2429 13/01/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 13/01/1960
Withdrawn 26/04/1969
Time in Service 9 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 10/1971
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66B Motherwell (New) 13/01/1960
66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 06/05/1961
66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/08/1962
62B Dundee West 5w/e 31/08/1968
   Withdrawn 26/04/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/01/1960 To Service To service as D2429
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Motherwell (66B)
   
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
27/08/1968 Sightings Dundee depot: Around the area - On the shed RO 12/1968 Link
31/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (62B)    
26/04/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2429    
10/1971 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev