Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2430 25/01/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 25/01/1960
Withdrawn 15/06/1968
Time in Service 8 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At Campbells (Airdrie)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66C Hamilton (West) (New) 25/01/1960
66B Motherwell 4w/e 04/06/1960
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 16/03/1963
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 27/04/1968
   Withdrawn 15/06/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/01/1960 To Service To service as D2430
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)
   
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
27/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
15/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2430    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev