Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2434 28/03/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 28/03/1960
Withdrawn 07/1969
Time in Service 9 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 10/1971
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
67C Ayr (New) 28/03/1960
67F Stranraer 5w/e 29/04/1967
67C Ayr 5w/e 30/03/1968
65A Eastfield 3w/e 29/06/1968
   Withdrawn 07/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1960 To Service To service as D2434
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Ayr (67C)
   
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stranraer (67F)    
30/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
13/04/1968 Sightings Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow RCTS 6/1968 Link
29/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
07/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2434    
10/1971 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev