Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 712 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1659 Week
» 20441 Month
» 268734 Year
» 1153115 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2436 20/04/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 20/04/1960
Withdrawn 26/11/1971
Time in Service 11 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1973
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
67C Ayr (New) 20/04/1960
67B Hurlford 4w/e 27/02/1965
67C Ayr 9w/e 26/11/1966
65A Eastfield 5w/e 30/09/1967
   Withdrawn 26/11/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/04/1960 To Service To service as D2436
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Ayr (67C)
   
27/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
26/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
26/11/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2436    
15/04/1972 Sightings Polmadie depot: Dumped - Derelict and cannibalised   Link
01/11/1973 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev