Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 704 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1651 Week
» 20433 Month
» 268726 Year
» 1153107 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2438 30/05/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 30/05/1960
Withdrawn 19/11/1972
Time in Service 12 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1974
Cut At Campbells (Airdrie)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
67C Ayr (New) 30/05/1960
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 11/05/1963
62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 01/06/1968
62C Dunfermline Townhill 5w/e 01/08/1970
   Withdrawn 19/11/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/05/1960 To Service To service as D2438
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Ayr (67C)
   
11/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
01/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
01/08/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C)    
19/11/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D2438    
01/08/1974 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev