Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2439 21/06/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/06/1960
Withdrawn 26/11/1971
Time in Service 11 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
67A Corkerhill (New) 21/06/1960
65A Eastfield 4w/e 26/08/1967
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 27/04/1968
62C Dunfermline Townhill 5w/e 01/08/1970
   Withdrawn 26/11/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/06/1960 To Service To service as D2439
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Corkerhill (67A)
   
26/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
27/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
01/08/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C)    
26/11/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2439    
01/03/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev