Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2441 17/08/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 17/08/1960
Withdrawn 01/03/1967
Time in Service 6 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1967
Cut At Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
67A Corkerhill (New) 17/08/1960
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 16/02/1963
   Withdrawn 01/03/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/08/1960 To Service To service as D2441
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Corkerhill (67A)
   
16/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
01/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2441    
01/10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles    
14/10/1967 Sightings Slag Reduction Co., Ickles scrapyard: Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) RCTS 1/1968 Link

prev prev