Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2443 28/09/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 28/09/1960
Withdrawn 18/06/1972
Time in Service 11 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1973
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
67A Corkerhill (New) 28/09/1960
66C Hamilton (West) 5w/e 30/05/1964
67B Hurlford 4w/e 27/02/1965
67C Ayr 9w/e 26/11/1966
64B Haymarket 4w/e 24/02/1968
64H Leith Central 4w/e 28/12/1968
62C Dunfermline Townhill 5w/e 06/02/1971
62B Dundee West 4w/e 30/10/1971
   Withdrawn 18/06/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/09/1960 To Service To service as D2443
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Corkerhill (67A)
   
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
27/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
26/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
24/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
28/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
06/02/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C)    
30/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (62B)    
18/06/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D2443    
01/05/1973 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev