Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 129 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17932 Week
» 70948 Month
» 190475 Year
» 3217328 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2444 |
31/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
06010 |
01/1975 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2444 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
05/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
24/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (DE) |
|
|
01/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 06010 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 06010 |
|
|
04/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|