Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2444 31/10/1960
TOPS (Tops) 06010 01/1975

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 31/10/1960
Withdrawn 14/06/1975
Time in Service 14 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1979
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
67A Corkerhill (New) 31/10/1960
66A Polmadie 4w/e 24/03/1962
66B Motherwell 4w/e 08/09/1962
60A Inverness 4w/e 24/11/1962
63A Perth South 4w/e 25/01/1964
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 04/12/1965
67C Ayr 4w/e 25/03/1967
65F Grangemouth 5w/e 30/09/1967
62B Dundee West 5w/e 05/08/1972
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 24/02/1973
DE Dundee West 4w/e 29/12/1973
   Withdrawn 14/06/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1960 To Service To service as D2444
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Corkerhill (67A)
   
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
24/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
05/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (62B)    
24/02/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
29/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (DE)    
01/1975 Renumbered Renumbered to 06010    
14/06/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 06010    
31/12/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev