Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 203 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1302 Week
» 7436 Month
» 235320 Year
» 1456885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2444   05/1893

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Dean
Class Dean Goods
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 92
Works Number 1374
To Service During 05/1893
Withdrawal During 11/1952
Service Life 59 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1893
SPM St Philips Marsh 8w/e 23/03/1946
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 23/03/1946
ALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC WES Westbury 4w/e 03/12/1949
WDN   m/e 30/11/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during September included: Nos. 1005, 1925, 1935, 2112, 2148, 2195, 2444, 2551, 2612, 3005, 3017, 3022, 3023, 5318, 5319, 5335, 5398, W.D. 77368, 78543 an 79274. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 200, 2723, 2731, 2733 an 2768. No. 5049 CDF (ex Works 23/9) has been fitted with an experimental Swindon design mechanical lubricator (similar to that fitted to No. 4905) and also a 4-row superheater. The present batch of new 'Hall' Class locos. which are of the modified or '6959' Class are being fitted with straight sided tenders; No. 6974 and onwards are being lined out. SLS/194711
18/06/1949 Unusual Workings The following unusual workings have been noted: On 30/6 No. 2444 (BL) working an excursion from Bristol-Weston-super-Mare, the load comprised eleven corridor coaches. It was observed returning the same evening with the same load. No. 4018 (SRD) working the 6.35 p.m, Paddington-Cheltenham. The locomotive worked through to Cheltenham. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1893 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2444
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1374
   
23/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM)    
11/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 2444    

prev prev