Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1812 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15218 Week
» 68234 Month
» 187761 Year
» 3214614 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2460 |
|
12/1895 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Dean Goods |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
99 |
Works Number |
1462 |
To Service |
During 12/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 14/04/1954 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,099,194 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
4w/e Sat 22/05/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1907 |
S2 boiler fitted |
12/1911 |
S4 boiler fitted |
04/1915 |
B4 boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2460 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1462 |
|
|
08/1907 |
Modification |
Modification: S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/12/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) |
|
|
14/04/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2460 |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|