Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 91 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19002 Week
» 83956 Month
» 286620 Year
» 3313473 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11118 |
25/01/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2502 |
06/01/1962 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/01/1956 |
|
No train brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/01/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11118 Built at Hudswell Clarke Allocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
06/01/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2502 |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
25/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
21/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2502 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|