Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 72 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17875 Week
» 70891 Month
» 190418 Year
» 3217271 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11119 |
31/01/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2503 |
23/09/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/01/1956 |
|
No train brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/01/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11119 Built at Hudswell Clarke Allocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2503 |
|
|
21/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
05/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2503 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|