Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 109 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17912 Week
» 70928 Month
» 190455 Year
» 3217308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11120 |
22/02/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2504 |
30/05/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/02/1956 |
|
No train brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/02/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11120 Built at Hudswell Clarke Allocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
30/05/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2504 |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
18/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2504 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|