Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1441 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19244 Week
» 72260 Month
» 191787 Year
» 3218640 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11146 |
30/04/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2507 |
28/10/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/04/1956 |
|
No train brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/04/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11146 Built at Hudswell Clarke Allocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
28/10/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2507 |
|
|
21/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2507 |
|
|
07/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|