Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 36 Online
» 4267 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19879 Week
» 118524 Month
» 321188 Year
» 3348041 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D251 |
30/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40051 |
13/10/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
30/12/1959 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
29/01/1978 off Healey Mills (HM) |
Reason for Withdrawal |
Rundown condition |
Time in Service |
18 yrs , 30 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 12/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Surplus to requirements,poor condition,required for spares |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
30/12/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D251 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
18/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
03/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
13/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40051 |
|
|
29/01/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40051 |
|
|
12/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|