Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 17034 Month
» 361213 Year
» 872315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2511 28/08/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D2/12
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Hudswell Clarke
Works Number D1202
To Service 28/08/1961
Withdrawn 30/12/1967
Time in Service 6 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
12E Barrow in Furness (New) 28/08/1961
12D Workington w/e 22/10/1966
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 24/06/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Preservation
Current Status Operational
Status Date 22/03/2011
Link www.kwvr.co.uk


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/08/1961 To Service To service as D2511
Built at Hudswell Clarke, Works Number D1202
Allocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)
   
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2511    

prev prev