Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2990 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16396 Week
» 69412 Month
» 188939 Year
» 3215792 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D252 |
21/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40052 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
21/12/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
22/03/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
22/03/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
05/06/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D252 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
22/03/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
29/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40052 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
17/06/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40052 |
|
|
10/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|