Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 849 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18652 Week
» 71668 Month
» 191195 Year
» 3218048 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2537 |
|
07/1897 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Dean Goods |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
108 |
Works Number |
1578 |
To Service |
During 07/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 20/01/1953 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1897 |
CDF |
|
Cardiff Canton |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/01/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
1903 |
S2 boiler fitted |
11/1905 |
S4 boiler fitted |
12/1914 |
B2 boiler fitted |
12/1917 |
B4 boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/02/1953 |
Swindon Works |
Arrivals from Darlington for fitting of A.T.C. Gear and other W.R. modifications, 78002. Tender B.R. 3. 941/52. 78003. Tender B.R. 3. 942/52 and 78004. Tender B.R. 3. 943/52, these are due to be allocated to the Central Wales Division. Dean 0-6-0s withdrawn from scrapping, noted in East Yard, Reception Shed, Dump and C. Shop : 2350 -; 2401 (89B); 2408 -; 2449 (89A); 2462 -; 2468 (89B); 2515 (85C); 2534 (82D); 2537 (86C); 2543, 2573 (81D). Eastern Region 60845 was noted fitted with Indicator Shelter on front end. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2537 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1578 |
|
|
1903 |
Modification |
Modification: S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1905 |
Modification |
Modification: S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: B2 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
20/01/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2537 |
|
|