Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1897 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19700 Week
» 72716 Month
» 192243 Year
» 3219096 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2551 |
|
11/1897 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Dean Goods |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
111 |
Works Number |
1632 |
To Service |
During 11/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 22/09/1953 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1897 |
WOS |
|
Worcester |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/09/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1917 |
S2 boiler fitted |
07/1921 |
B4 boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during September included: Nos. 1005, 1925, 1935, 2112, 2148, 2195, 2444, 2551, 2612, 3005, 3017, 3022, 3023, 5318, 5319, 5335, 5398, W.D. 77368, 78543 an 79274. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 200, 2723, 2731, 2733 an 2768. No. 5049 CDF (ex Works 23/9) has been fitted with an experimental Swindon design mechanical lubricator (similar to that fitted to No. 4905) and also a 4-row superheater. The present batch of new 'Hall' Class locos. which are of the modified or '6959' Class are being fitted with straight sided tenders; No. 6974 and onwards are being lined out. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2551 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1632 |
|
|
05/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
22/09/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2551 |
|
|