Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 17 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6232 Week
» 17937 Month
» 349426 Year
» 426013 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11140 13/05/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2554 24/01/1959
TOPS (Tops) 05001 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 05
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service 13/05/1956
Withdrawn 01/01/1981
Time in Service 24 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30F Parkeston Quay (New) 13/05/1956
70H Ryde (I.O.W.) w/e 25/06/1966
   Withdrawn 01/01/1981

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/05/1956 To Service To service as 11140
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)
   
14/02/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D2554    
25/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ryde (I.O.W.) (70H)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 05001    
01/01/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 05001    

prev prev