Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2880 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16286 Week
» 69302 Month
» 188829 Year
» 3215682 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11140 |
13/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2554 |
24/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
05001 |
08/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11140 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2554 |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryde (I.O.W.) (70H) |
|
|
08/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 05001 |
|
|
01/01/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 05001 |
|
|