Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2013 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19816 Week
» 72832 Month
» 192359 Year
» 3219212 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2556 |
|
11/1897 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Dean Goods |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
111 |
Works Number |
1637 |
To Service |
During 11/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/06/1953 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
85C |
Hereford |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1910 |
S2 boiler fitted |
09/1913 |
S4 boiler fitted |
03/1917 |
B4 boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2556 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1637 |
|
|
06/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brecon (BCN) |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brecon (BCN) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
29/06/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2556 |
|
|