Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4253 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17659 Week
» 70675 Month
» 190202 Year
» 3217055 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11143 |
16/08/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2557 |
16/05/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/08/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/08/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11143 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2557 |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
15/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2557 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|