Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11163 |
01/02/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2560 |
14/07/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/02/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/02/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11163 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
14/07/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2560 |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2560 from Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|